NJ AJR189 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR23
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR38
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR38
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New Jersey State Commission on Urban Violence."
Title
Establishes the "New Jersey State Commission on Urban Violence."
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR51 |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR189 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR51
SJR51 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-26.
SJR38 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR51 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-26.
SJR38 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR189 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/189_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR189 |