NJ AJR200 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SJR129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SJR129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates third Sunday of September of each year as "Puerto Rico Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates third Sunday of September of each year as "Puerto Rico Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR129 |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR129 (Same As) 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-20.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR200 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/200_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR200 |