NJ AJR26 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous AJR102
Note: Carryover of previous AJR102

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates September of each year as "Youth Suicide Prevention Awareness Month" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates September of each year as "Youth Suicide Prevention Awareness Month" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR47 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19SenateApproved P.L.2019, JR-17.
2019-05-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2019-05-30SenateSubstituted for SJR47 (1R)
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-06-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR102 (Carry Over) 2016-10-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR102 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Assembly Substitution (Benson)
SJR47 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by AJR26 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback