NJ AJR54 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR153
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR126
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "Cyber Security Awareness Month."
Title
Designates October of each year as "Cyber Security Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR54 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
AJR54 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR134 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR54 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR134 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR54 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/54_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR54 |