NJ AJR82 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR133
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR54
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR171
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR54
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designates May as "Preeclampsia Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designates May as "Preeclampsia Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR82 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR82 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR171 (Carry Over) 2017-08-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SJR90 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR82 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR171 (Carry Over) 2017-08-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SJR90 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR82 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/82_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR82 |