NJ AR149 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR86
Note: Carry Foward to future AR144
Note: Carry Foward to future AR144
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress of United States to continue federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program.
Title
Urges President and Congress of United States to continue federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (72-1-2) |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR149 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR149 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR86 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
AR149 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR86 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AR149 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AR/149_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR149 |