NJ AR167 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Federal Aviation Administration to require air carriers to submit annual sexual assault reports.
Title
Urges Federal Aviation Administration to require air carriers to submit annual sexual assault reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR89 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AR167 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AR/167_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR167 |