NJ AR179 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests federal legislation relating to COVID-19 financial relief include money for states to fund emergency grants for diaper banks.
Title
Requests federal legislation relating to COVID-19 financial relief include money for states to fund emergency grants for diaper banks.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (73-0-4) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AR179 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AR/179_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR179 |