NJ AR180 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges passage and enactment of federal "Child Care Is Essential Act."
Title
Urges passage and enactment of federal "Child Care Is Essential Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (71-1-5) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |