NJ AR223 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates 40th anniversary of enactment of "Taiwan Relations Act" and 30th anniversary of New Jersey-Taiwan sister state relationship and recognizes importance of strong and enduring relations between New Jersey and Taiwan.
Title
Commemorates 40th anniversary of enactment of "Taiwan Relations Act" and 30th anniversary of New Jersey-Taiwan sister state relationship and recognizes importance of strong and enduring relations between New Jersey and Taiwan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (78-0-0) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR137 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AR223 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AR/223_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR223 |