NJ AR244 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress of US to enact law prohibiting airline from counting breast milk or breast pumps against airline's carry-on limit or restricting passengers from carrying breast milk onto aircraft.
Title
Urges President and Congress of US to enact law prohibiting airline from counting breast milk or breast pumps against airline's carry-on limit or restricting passengers from carrying breast milk onto aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (75-0-2) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR166 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AR244 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AR/244_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR244 |