NJ AR85 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous AR245

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress enact Military Surviving Spouses Equity Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Congress enact Military Surviving Spouses Equity Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2019-02-25AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (76-0-0)
2018-10-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AR245 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SR82 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Filed with Secretary of State

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback