NJ AR86 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR41
Note: Carry Over of previous AR75
Note: Carry Over of previous SR63
Note: Carry Over of previous AR75
Note: Carry Over of previous SR63
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to provide Medicare coverage for eyeglasses, hearing aids, and dentures.
Title
Memorializes Congress to provide Medicare coverage for eyeglasses, hearing aids, and dentures.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (74-1-4) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR86 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR29 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AR75 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SR63 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR29 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AR75 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SR63 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee