NJ S101 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S816
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.164.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.164.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes commission to approve personalized handguns; requires firearm retailers to sell personalized handguns.
Title
Establishes commission to approve personalized handguns; requires firearm retailers to sell personalized handguns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1016 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1016 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.164. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-12) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-23-4) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1016 (1R) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-13) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S816 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A1016 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S101 (1R)
A1016 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S101 (1R)