NJ S101 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates use of body cameras worn by law enforcement officers.
Title
Regulates use of body cameras worn by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4312 |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S556 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4312 (Same As) 2020-11-24 - Approved P.L.2020, c.129.
A4312 (Same As) 2020-11-24 - Approved P.L.2020, c.129.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S101 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/101_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S101 |