NJ S1014 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2816
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.249.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.249.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes composition of State Employment and Training Commission.
Title
Changes composition of State Employment and Training Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2407 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2407 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.249. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A2407 (2R) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2816 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
A2407 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1014 (2R)
A2407 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1014 (2R)