NJ S1034 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S179
Note: Carry Foward to future A2275
Note: Carry Over of previous S4034
Note: Carry Foward to future A2275
Note: Carry Over of previous S4034
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for spaying and neutering stray or feral cats and establishes fund therefor; designated as "Compassion for Community Cats Law."
Title
Provides for spaying and neutering stray or feral cats and establishes fund therefor; designated as "Compassion for Community Cats Law."
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1034 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1034 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4034 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4399 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1034 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4034 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4399 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee