NJ S104 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S992
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns equal pay and employment discrimination.*
Title
Concerns equal pay and employment discrimination.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.9. |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-2-0) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A1 |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S992 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A1850 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A1 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by S104 (2R)
A1850 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A1 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by S104 (2R)