NJ S1065 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows assistance animals in rental housing units; expands protection under "Law against Discrimination."
Title
Allows assistance animals in rental housing units; expands protection under "Law against Discrimination."
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2708 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee