NJ S1072 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2451

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A1504 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Medical Aid in Dying for the Terminally Ill Act"; permits qualified terminally ill patient to self-administer medication to end life in humane and dignified manner.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Medical Aid in Dying for the Terminally Ill Act"; permits qualified terminally ill patient to self-administer medication to end life in humane and dignified manner.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A1504 (2R)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1504 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Approved P.L.2019, c.59.
A2451 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback