NJ S1073 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes municipalities, counties, and certain authorities to establish stormwater utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes municipalities, counties, and certain authorities to establish stormwater utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2694 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.42.
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-11)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (45-31-0)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A2694 (ACS/1R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-22AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (25-15)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-10SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2694 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S1073 (SCS/2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback