NJ S1080 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns driver's license suspension for certain crimes and offenses.***
Title
Concerns driver's license suspension for certain crimes and offenses.***
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5191 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5191 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.276. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-9-4) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Concur by Senate Amendments (28-3) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-15-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A5191 (ACS/2R) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-10) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Turner) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3222 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5191 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1080 (SCS/5R)
A5191 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1080 (SCS/5R)