NJ S110 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S396
Note: Carry Foward to future A3840
Note: Carry Over of previous S417
Note: Carry Foward to future A3840
Note: Carry Over of previous S417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Forbids members of the State Investment Council from voting on transactions concerning investment with which a member has certain financial or familial conflicts and requires removal for violations thereof.
Title
Forbids members of the State Investment Council from voting on transactions concerning investment with which a member has certain financial or familial conflicts and requires removal for violations thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio) |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S110 (Carry Over) 2017-10-05 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio)
S110 (Carry Over) 2017-10-05 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio)
S417 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S110 (Carry Over) 2017-10-05 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio)
S417 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee