NJ S1126 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1208
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.250.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.250.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school districts to provide instruction on "New Jersey Safe Haven Infant Protection Act" as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards.
Title
Requires public school districts to provide instruction on "New Jersey Safe Haven Infant Protection Act" as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for S1380 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for S1380 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.250. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A1380 (2R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1380 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S1126 (2R)
S1208 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S1208 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee