NJ S1140 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1193
Note: Carry Foward to future A314
Note: Carry Over of previous S2902
Note: Carry Foward to future A314
Note: Carry Over of previous S2902
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to cash payroll checks under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires financial institutions to cash payroll checks under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2902 (Carry Over) 2017-01-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A602 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2902 (Carry Over) 2017-01-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A602 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading