NJ S1150 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3211

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes DCA to establish flexible multiple dwelling inspection schedule; requires multiple dwelling owners to file certain registrations. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes DCA to establish flexible multiple dwelling inspection schedule; requires multiple dwelling owners to file certain registrations. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3211 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5041 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback