NJ S122 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1053
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credit for certain expenses incurred for production of certain films and digital media content; designated as Garden State Film and Digital Media Jobs Act.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credit for certain expenses incurred for production of certain films and digital media content; designated as Garden State Film and Digital Media Jobs Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1038 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1038 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.56. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-17-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (34-3) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-6) |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-3) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-14-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (50-23-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bucco) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A1038 (1R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-5) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1053 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1038 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S122 (2R)
A1038 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S122 (2R)