NJ S1245 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.154.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.154.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes housing of equine-related farm employees in facilities with horses under certain conditions as "Right to Farm" permissible activity; requires State Agriculture Development Committee agricultural management practice that permits such housing.
Title
Establishes housing of equine-related farm employees in facilities with horses under certain conditions as "Right to Farm" permissible activity; requires State Agriculture Development Committee agricultural management practice that permits such housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2768 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.154. |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-1-0) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2768 (1R) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2768 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1245 (1R)