NJ S1261 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1448
Note: Carry Foward to future A250
Note: Carry Over of previous A5196
Note: Carry Foward to future A250
Note: Carry Over of previous A5196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fire safety standards and protocols for certain light frame residential construction; requires placards identifying primary structural systems of buildings.
Title
Establishes fire safety standards and protocols for certain light frame residential construction; requires placards identifying primary structural systems of buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1261 (Carry Over) 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1261 (Carry Over) 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A135 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A5196 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1261 (Carry Over) 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A135 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A5196 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee