NJ S1265 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1871
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no more than 120 credits will be required for baccalaureate degree awarded by a public institution and no more than 60 credits for an associate degree.
Title
Provides that no more than 120 credits will be required for baccalaureate degree awarded by a public institution and no more than 60 credits for an associate degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3634 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.93. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-3) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A3634 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S1871 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3634 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S1265
A3634 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S1265