NJ S1269 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns NJ Transit's treatment of people with guide or service dogs; establishes Access Link Customer Service Group.
Title
Concerns NJ Transit's treatment of people with guide or service dogs; establishes Access Link Customer Service Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1992 (Same As) 2013-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading