NJ S1295 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures to prevent and eradicate bedbug infestations in certain residential property.
Title
Establishes procedures to prevent and eradicate bedbug infestations in certain residential property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1271 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1349 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1349 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee