NJ S1298 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1766
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.393.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.393.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities to provide information on property tax bills concerning amount of local tax dollars saved through shared services.
Title
Permits municipalities to provide information on property tax bills concerning amount of local tax dollars saved through shared services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2972 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2972 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.393. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A2972 (ACS) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2972 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1298 (1R)
S1766 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1766 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee