NJ S1318 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1615
Note: Carry Over of previous S3579
Note: Carry Over of previous S3579
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.394.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.394.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties and non-governmental, community-based agencies to establish family justice centers which provide coordinated, multi-agency governmental and non-governmental assistance to victims of certain crimes and offenses, including domestic violence, and their family members.
Title
Permits counties and non-governmental, community-based agencies to establish family justice centers which provide coordinated, multi-agency governmental and non-governmental assistance to victims of certain crimes and offenses, including domestic violence, and their family members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3156 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.394. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3156 (1R) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1318 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.394.
A3156 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1318 (2R)
S3579 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3156 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1318 (2R)
S3579 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee