NJ S1331 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S514

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends eligibility for veterans' property tax deduction to exemption to residents of continuing care retirement communities.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends eligibility for veterans' property tax deduction to exemption to residents of continuing care retirement communities.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3163 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3163 (2R)
2019-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (36-0) (Gopal)
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3163 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1331 (2R)
S514 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback