NJ S1335 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1425
Note: Carry Foward to future A498
Note: Carry Over of previous A4478
Note: Carry Foward to future A498
Note: Carry Over of previous A4478
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to accept emergency medical technician and paramedic certification cards as two points of documentation for purposes of MVC identification verification program.
Title
Requires MVC to accept emergency medical technician and paramedic certification cards as two points of documentation for purposes of MVC identification verification program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1335 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1335 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A311 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4478 (Carry Over) 2017-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1335 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A311 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4478 (Carry Over) 2017-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee