NJ S1391 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that use of propane-powered noise making device is allowed as non-lethal method of wildlife control on farmland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies that use of propane-powered noise making device is allowed as non-lethal method of wildlife control on farmland.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted by A2732
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2732 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.19.
S2204 (Carry Over) 2016-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback