NJ S1538 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1431
Note: Carry Foward to future A3800
Note: Carry Over of previous A290
Note: Carry Foward to future A3800
Note: Carry Over of previous A290
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for pediatric cancer research.
Title
Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for pediatric cancer research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1538 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1538 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A894 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A290 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1538 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A894 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A290 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee