NJ S1570 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3247

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Senate Substitution (28-0) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates certain assistance and set-aside programs for businesses owned by lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender persons, by persons with a disability, and by veterans.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates certain assistance and set-aside programs for businesses owned by lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender persons, by persons with a disability, and by veterans.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSenate Substitution (28-0) (Weinberg)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3162 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Senate Amendment (26-0) (Weinberg)
S3247 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A3891 (ACS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback