NJ S1575 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.
Title
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A344 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A344 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.460.
A2943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
A2943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)