NJ S1586 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2425
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A1100 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A1100 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Monmouth County and Atlantic County as pilot counties for purposes of "Common Sense Shared Services Pilot Program Act." *
Title
Adds Monmouth County and Atlantic County as pilot counties for purposes of "Common Sense Shared Services Pilot Program Act." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A1100 (2R) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1100 (Same As) 2018-11-27 - Approved P.L.2018, c.140.
S2425 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2425 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee