NJ S1591 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S916
Note: Carry Over of previous S2772
Note: Carry Over of previous S2772
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an annual State debt affordability analysis be included in the State Debt Report.
Title
Requires an annual State debt affordability analysis be included in the State Debt Report.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1591 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S341 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2772 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S341 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2772 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee