NJ S1618 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2202
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A791 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A791 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institution of higher education to award appropriate credit for student's military service.
Title
Requires institution of higher education to award appropriate credit for student's military service.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] |
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A791 (2R) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A781 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A791 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.327.
A781 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A791 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.327.