NJ S1656 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2593

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Veterans Assistance Grant Program for nonprofit organizations to provide certain services to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Veterans Assistance Grant Program for nonprofit organizations to provide certain services to veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1102 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2593 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback