NJ S1683 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2206
Note: Carry Over of previous S2306
Note: Carry Over of previous S2306
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.397.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.397.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns regulation of solid waste, hazardous waste, and soil and fill recycling industries.*
Title
Concerns regulation of solid waste, hazardous waste, and soil and fill recycling industries.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4267 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.397. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4267 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Smith) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Smith) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1683 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.397.
S2306 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4267 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1683 (3R)
S2306 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4267 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1683 (3R)