NJ S1733 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2191
Note: Carry Foward to future A1406
Note: Carry Over of previous S3400
Note: Carry Foward to future A1406
Note: Carry Over of previous S3400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum Medicaid reimbursement rates for private duty nursing services.
Title
Establishes minimum Medicaid reimbursement rates for private duty nursing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1733 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1733 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3400 (Carry Over) 2017-07-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4575 (Same As) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1733 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3400 (Carry Over) 2017-07-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4575 (Same As) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee