NJ S1739 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.219.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Renames county corrections officers as county correctional police officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renames county corrections officers as county correctional police officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3236 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.219.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3236 (1R)
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2018-02-26SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Van Drew)
2018-02-08SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3236 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1739 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback