NJ S1753 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A1190 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A1190 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns appointment of person to control funeral and disposition of human remains.
Title
Concerns appointment of person to control funeral and disposition of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted by A1190 (ACS) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1190 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.187.
S3116 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3116 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee