NJ S1758 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3600
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies donated leave program for State employees in career, senior executive, and unclassified service.
Title
Codifies donated leave program for State employees in career, senior executive, and unclassified service.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A346 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A346 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.129. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A346 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A346 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1758
A3600 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S1401 (1R)
A3600 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S1401 (1R)