NJ S1818 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A462
Note: Carry Over of previous A962
Note: Carry Over of previous A962
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes General Fund supplemental appropriation of $500,000 to DMVA for Council on Armed Forces and Veterans' Affairs for preservation of military installations in case of base realignment and closure.
Title
Makes General Fund supplemental appropriation of $500,000 to DMVA for Council on Armed Forces and Veterans' Affairs for preservation of military installations in case of base realignment and closure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1818 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A630 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A962 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A630 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A962 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee